THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:18:55 AM
Goldthorpe, Wilfred Gary
CPSO#:
18402
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Nov 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Dr. Goldthorpe
PO Box 2094
789 Drayton Road
Sioux Lookout, Ontario
P8T 1J7
Date Received: 20 Jan 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1962 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Nov 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1965 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Oct 1968 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2009 |