skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 09/08/22 22:14:22 PM

Smoling, Leslie Frank

CPSO#: 18357

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 29 Sep 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hungarian, Italian

Education: University of Sciences,Budapest, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1962
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1981
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 29 Sep 1993

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Sep 1993
Summary:

In September 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Smoling guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(22) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee further found Dr. Smoling incompetent, as defined in s. 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in practice. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Smoling's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1995-08-17
Hearing Date(s): 25 Aug 1993