THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:53:49 AM
Nash, Martin
CPSO#:
18303
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jun 1962
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1962 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2004 |
Concerns
Source:
Discipline Committee
Active Date: March 11, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On March 11, 2004, Dr. Martin Nash signed the following undertaking to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:
I, Dr. Martin Nash, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no later than June 1, 2004.
I promise not to apply for registration as a physician or a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.
I consent to this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.
I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario has agreed to withdraw the allegation that Dr. Nash engaged in impropriety with a patient as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated August 21, 2003, which allegation of professional misconduct is currently pending before the Discipline Committee.
I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking.
The CPSO withdrew the allegation of professional misconduct on August 16, 2004.