THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:20:20 AM
Roncaioli, Joseph
CPSO#:
18257
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
03 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Mar 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:04 Dec 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1962 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: March 15, 2005
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Joseph Roncaioli undertakes to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario that,
effective March 15, 2005, he will not practise medicine
in any jurisdiction.