THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:12:10 AM
Kazdan, Jerome Jack
CPSO#:
18106
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Sep 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Dolutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON
M6B 3Z4
Phone: 1(888) 781-9083
Dr. Seymour Albert Hershenfeld (CPSO# 29866)
7 Elmwood Avenue
North York, ON
M2N 6R6
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Date Received: 22 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:02 Dec 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |