THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:19:13 AM
Mohamed, John Kenneth
CPSO#:
18101
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Mar 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:c/o Dr. A. Aziz
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 2C3
Date Received: 30 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:05 Dec 1966 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Apr 1963 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |