THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/10/23 9:28:50 AM
Noronha, Aloysius Joseph Anthony
CPSO#:
18069
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
3-Dec-2016
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Bombay, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Dec 1957 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:02 Dec 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jun 2009 |