skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/06/22 5:44:24 AM

Moldofsky, Harvey

CPSO#: 18034

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jul 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Moldofsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2016
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Dr. Satyendra Sharma 
1054 Wilson Ave
Toronto, ON  M3K 2A7
Telephone: 416-746-3012
Date Received: 08 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020