skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/09/21 0:27:08 AM

Vigh, Sandor Gyula

CPSO#: 18013

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jul 1961

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Franz Joseph University of Kolozsvar, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Dec 1985
Summary:

 In December 1985, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vigh guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Vigh's licence to practice be suspended for a period of 120 days.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 06 Nov 1985