THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
08/12/23 23:51:31 PM
Betts, Douglas Hilchie
CPSO#:
17955
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
01 Oct 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Jan 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jan 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 1977 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Feb 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1989 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Oct 2001 |