THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:53:42 AM
Farrington, William Charles
CPSO#:
17941
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Jun 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, Ontario
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 14 Jul 2009
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2009 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jan 2009
Summary:
On January 9, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Farrington has committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Farrington to pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order. As well, the Committee ordered the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 9, 2009