skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/08/22 2:07:30 AM

Brown, Gregory Michael

CPSO#: 17833

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
100 Stokes Street
Toronto, ON  M6J 1H4
Date Received: 09 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:11 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2014