THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:44:04 AM
Macdonald, John Cameron
CPSO#:
17803
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Feb 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Windsor Radiology Associates
1550 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N8X 1K7
Date Received: 16 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:16 Nov 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Mar 1973
Summary:
In March 1973, the Discipline Committee found Dr. MacDonald guilty of professional misconduct in that he charged OHIP for services not rendered. The Committee subsequently ordered his licence to be suspended for one month.
Appeal: Decision Upheld
Appeal Decision Date: 1975-04-18
Hearing Date(s): 16 Mar 1973