THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:58:14 AM
Prince, William Ross
CPSO#:
17798
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Feb 1961
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:162 Dianne Ave, Oakville,ON,,L6J H1
Date Received: 28 Apr 2022
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should send a written request to: 162 Dianne Ave, Oakville, ON, L6J 4H1; Fax: 905 845 3272
Date Received: 18 Nov 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:15 Nov 1965 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1960 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Apr 2022 |