skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 09/12/22 4:35:06 AM

Cooper, Alfred Joseph

CPSO#: 17729

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
22 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Sep 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English, Ojibwa

Education: University of Ottawa, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1960
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 06 Nov 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1993
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 07 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1997
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 May 1991
Summary:

In May 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cooper guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Committee further found Dr. Cooper guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he made improper use of the authority to prescribe, sell or dispense a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a drug, contrary to s. 27(26); in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Cooper(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1992-11-06
Hearing Date(s): May 10, 1991

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 15 Apr 1996
Decision: Application Accepted