skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/04/21 9:31:18 AM

McKay, Angus Robert

CPSO#: 17708

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Sep 1960

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 7-Nov-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Street Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Telephone: 416-398-0638
Date Received: 18 Oct 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1960
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014