skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/08/22 1:43:12 AM

Rudd, William Warren Hethrington

CPSO#: 17591

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 May 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education: University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1960
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 May 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Aug 2018
Summary:

On August 10, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. William Warren Hethrington Rudd committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Rudd is a retired colorectal surgeon, who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College in July 1960 and permanently retired from the practice of medicine on May 25, 2018. Prior to his retirement, Dr. Rudd practised in Toronto at an outpatient clinic where he performed anorectal surgery and colonoscopy.

Patient A

Patient A was first seen by Dr. Rudd in September 2013 for a complete anorectal examination which involved a sigmoidoscopy. She returned to see Dr. Rudd one year later, in September 2014. At that appointment, Dr. Rudd performed a medically-indicated anorectal examination, including an anoscopy, which is less invasive than a sigmoidoscopy. When the examination was complete, Dr. Rudd did not take sufficient care to maintain Patient A’s privacy and spatial boundaries. This included touching one side of Patient A’s buttocks indicating the end of the examination, removing the paper drape and helping Patient A pull up her trousers. Dr. Rudd was accompanied by a nurse throughout the patient encounter.

Patient A found the appointment distressing and continues to be affected by Dr. Rudd’s conduct.

After the appointment, she expressed her concerns to her family doctor. She did not return to see Dr. Rudd following her appointment.

Patient B

Patient B was seen by Dr. Rudd in November 2017 for an anorectal examination which involved an anoscopy and sigmoidoscopy. Patient B was diagnosed with an anal fissure. On the way to the examination room, Dr. Rudd made an unprofessional comment to Patient B and another patient. During the course of the encounter, Dr. Rudd also made inappropriate comments about Patient B’s appearance and inquired about her personal life.

During the appointment, Dr. Rudd did not obtain consent in an appropriate manner and did not take sufficient care to ensure privacy and appropriate coverage of Patient B. After his examination, Dr. Rudd instructed her on how to keep the affected area clean and dry and suggested certain treatments. As part of this process Dr. Rudd demonstrated proper ano-rectal self-care by placing his gloved hand on Patient B’s hands to guide her, without first ensuring she consented to him doing so. Dr. Rudd was accompanied by a nurse throughout the patient encounter.

Patient B was distraught after the appointment and expressed her concerns to her husband and her family doctor. Patient B did not return to see Dr. Rudd following this appointment.

Relevant College History

In response to a public complaint from a patient, Dr. Rudd signed an undertaking to the College in 1992, which included the term that Dr. Rudd “must adopt/take all reasonable measures to continue to ensure to the extent practicable the comfort and dignity of his patients”.

In January 1995, Dr. Rudd was cautioned by the Complaints Committee regarding sensitivity around assisting patients to pull up their undergarments and trousers following anorectal examinations. Dr. Rudd was directed to ask patients if they want help and, if so, to offer to have his nurse provide assistance.

In March 2012, after reviewing materials from the investigation of a public complaint, the Inquiries Complaints and Reports Committee took no further action on the complaint. However, in its Decision and Reasons, the Committee indicated that, “ Rudd could probably have been a lot more sensitive in his communications with a young and anxious patient who was likely undergoing an anal/rectal examination with a scope for the first time. The Committee expects that Dr. Rudd will keep in mind the importance of sensitivity and patience in his communications in the future.” Undertaking to the College Dr. Rudd entered into an undertaking to the College on May 7, 2018, by which he agreed to resign his certificate of registration, effective May 25, 2018

Disposition

On August 10, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
Dr. Rudd attend before the panel to be reprimanded.

- Dr. Rudd pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): August 10, 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Willim Warren Hethrington Rudd to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 7, 2018:

Dr. Rudd was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct with respect to two patients and sexual abuse involving sexual comments with respect to one patient. After the allegations were referred to the Discipline Committee and prior to the hearing, Dr. Rudd resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. Prior to his resignation, Dr. Rudd will continue to ensure that a regulated health professional is present for the entire duration of every patient encounter.
Download Full Document (PDF)