THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:15:23 AM
Macdonald, Robert Gene
CPSO#:
17491
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
01 Dec 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1960 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Apr 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Jan 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Sep 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 1991 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Dec 1995 |