THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:53:12 PM
Kletke, Richard Rudolph
CPSO#:
17399
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
02 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1960 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 May 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1969 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 22 Jan 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2002 |