THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:08:35 PM
Fowler, John Harvey
CPSO#:
17083
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1959
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1. Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave, East York, ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
2. Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
3. Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
1 Bridgepoint Dr, Toronto, ON M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252
4. Providence Healthcare
3276 St Clair Ave E, Scarborough, ON M1L 1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Date Received: 04 Jun 2018
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may leave a message for Dr. Fowler at:
Tel: 416-483-5106 with their contact information and records request so that Dr. Fowler may contact them regarding their request
Date Received: 31 Jan 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:14 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1959 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2018 |