THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:42:29 AM
Brook, John Roger
CPSO#:
16892
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 May 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1974 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1958 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 May 2016 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Roger Brook to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 17, 2016:
Dr. Brook was the subject of a complaint about his conduct and his standard of practice in his family practice. During the investigation, Dr. Brook resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)