skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/05/22 7:49:58 AM

Clements, Duaine Arlene

CPSO#: 16340

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1957
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2006

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Jun 2006
Summary:

On June 5, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Clements to have committed professional misconduct that would be regarded by members to be disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee ordered Dr. Clements to be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register.

Dr. Clements signed the following undertaking on June 1, 2006:

1. I, Dr. Duaine Clements, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no later than 11:59 p.m. on June 30, 2006.

2. I, Dr. Duaine Clements, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

3. I, Dr. Duaine Clements, consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.

4. I, Dr. Duaine Clements, agree that, in any event that the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario should become aware that I have either applied, reapplied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practice medicine in any jurisdiction, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario shall, in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking.

5. I, Dr. Duaine Clements, acknowledge that I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking
.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 05, 2006