skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/12/22 20:44:07 PM

Cowan, Donald Henry

CPSO#: 16300

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Jul 1957

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 22-Dec-2014

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: 

Sunnybrook Health Services Centre 
Health Records
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto, ON
M4N 3M5
Date Received: 29 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012