THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:33:49 AM
Jones, Gerald Edward
CPSO#:
16135
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 May 1957
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
25-Jul-2012
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1957 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2000 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 May 1988
Summary:
In May 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Jones guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Jones be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded in the Register. The Committee also ruled that Dr. Jones' licence to practice be suspended for three months, with the suspension itself to be suspended provided that the Doctor cooperate in an investigation of his practice of the kind provided for in s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 30 May 1988