THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:18:58 PM
Barrington, Thomas William
CPSO#:
15959
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Oct 1956
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
22-Feb-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1956
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
Tel: 416 398 0638
Date Received: 19 Aug 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:25 Nov 1963 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 1956 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2015 |