THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 4:50:05 AM
Pollock, Piney
CPSO#:
15173
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1951
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
|
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1955 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2008 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2008 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: October 31, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Piney Pollock to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):
I, DR. PINEY POLLOCK:
1). Hereby resign from the College, effective October 31, 2008.
3). Undertake not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
4). Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as public information.
5). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated September 4, 2008, for failing to maintain standard of practice of the profession and incompetence.
6). By entering into this undertaking, do not admit any of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated September 4, 2008 (the “Notice”). 8). Agree that if the College should became aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice.