THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:28:00 AM
Rosen, Lawrence Jehuda
CPSO#:
14894
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
24 Apr 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Yiddish
Education: University of Toronto, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:09 Nov 1959 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1954 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2000 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2000 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2000 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2000 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2001 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 24 Apr 2001 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Apr 2001
Summary:
On April 24, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Rosen's guilty plea and found him guilty, under subsection 34(3)(c) of The Medical Act, of misconduct in a professional respect regarding sexual impropriety.
The Committee directed that Dr. Rosen be reprimanded and that the Registrar revoke Dr. Rosen's certificate of registration to take effect immediately.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 24, 2001
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 May 2000
Summary:
In May 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Rosen guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient, sexually abused patients, failed to retain the required records for a patient for a period of six years after the date of the last entry in the record and unprofessional conduct.
On September 13, 2000, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty:
Dr. Rosen be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.
the Registrar suspend Dr. Rosen’s certificate of registration for a period of six months, three months of which will be suspended on the following conditions (the “suspension”):
Dr. Rosen attends and successfully completes a suitable course on boundaries approved by the Registrar within six months;
provides a letter of credit to the College within thirty days of the date of this order becoming final in the sum of $10,000 for a period of five years for funding for therapy for each of the complainants;
Dr. Rosen continues, as a term, condition and restriction on his certificate of registration, the attached monitoring agreement, in which he has agreed to have a nurse present for any examination or procedure performed on female patients, subject to the exception set out in sub-paragraph (d) below; and
Dr. Rosen may examine minor female patients in the presence of their parents without the presence of a nurse.
3. the suspension will commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar.
4. any breach of the terms and conditions set out in this order will be cause for the immediate institution of the remaining three month suspension period and could be cause for further disciplinary proceedings.
5. Dr. Rosen to pay the costs of these proceedings fixed in the sum of $5,000.00, said costs to be paid within ten months of the date of this order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 10, 1999