THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:48:37 PM
Babb, Isadore Louis
CPSO#:
14770
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Apr 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
17-Sep-2015
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1950
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1958 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1954 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jul 2001 |