THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:55:36 PM
Petrasek, Anthony
CPSO#:
14652
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Feb 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain medical records may write to the following address:
Attn: Dr. John Petrasek
Brampton Civic Hospital
W O H C
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton, ON
L6R 3J7
Date Received: 28 Oct 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Nov 1960 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1954 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Apr 1965 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2010 |