THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:44:26 AM
Carter, Gordon Wilfred
CPSO#:
14371
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jul 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1953
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1977 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1953 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jan 1961 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 1965 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 May 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2000 |