skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 13/07/20 2:00:22 AM

Quirk, Keith Castle

CPSO#: 14263

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 11-Oct-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: J.E.Y's Business Records Storage 871 Jet Avenue P1B 2W9 Tel: 705-494-7575 Fax: 705-494-7428
Date Received: 07 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013