THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:20:05 PM
Gill, Russell Alexander
CPSO#:
13297
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Nov 1950
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
18-Jul-2005
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: English Conjoint Board, 1941
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1953 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1955 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 1950 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2004 |