skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/12/21 21:20:53 PM

Crassweller, Peter Owen

CPSO#: 11672

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rajni Bhatia and Dr. Deepak MurthyMedicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Crassweller ( CPSO# 11672 )
Dr. R. Bhatia ( CPSO# 100413)
Dr. D. Murthy ( CPSO# 111672)

Business Address:
450 Blanche St
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0

Business Address:
20-2891 Old Lakeshore Rd
Bright's Grove ON  N0N 1C0

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist
Urology Effective:01 Jan 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1945
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1985