THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 17:08:14 PM
Hophing, Lauren Jane
CPSO#:
115231
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
01 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2018
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
|
Active |