skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 19:56:09 PM

Mogla, Tanya

CPSO#: 114471

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
68 Abell St
Abell Medical Centre
Toronto ON  M6J 0B1
Phone: 647-943-1966
Fax: 647-943-1969 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tanya Mogla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mogla ( CPSO# 114471)

Business Address:
68 Abell St
Unit 6
Toronto ON  M6J 0B1
Phone Number: 647-943-1966

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Jul 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TANYA MOGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOGLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018