skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/12/22 10:49:54 AM

Trottier, Carolyn Edith

CPSO#: 112499

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Victoria Ave
La Verendrye Hospital
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone: (807) 274-3261 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carolyn Trottier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Trottier ( CPSO# 112499)

Business Address:
110 Victoria Ave
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Mar 2020 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLYN EDITH TROTTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TROTTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 13 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Aug 2018 to 23 Feb 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Feb 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 09 Mar 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2020