THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:31:01 AM
Hamel, Erik Michael
CPSO#:
112262
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2017
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Phone: 905-985-2895 Ext. 5417
Fax: 844-907-2012
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site |
Wiarton |
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site |
Port Perry |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIK MICHAEL HAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2021 to 19 Dec 2021
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2019 |