skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 11/08/22 23:37:21 PM

Peng, Si-Liang

CPSO#: 110910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
564 Belmont Ave West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: 519-579-0624
Fax: 519-579-2954 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St-Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blv
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 519-744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Peng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peng ( CPSO# 110910)

Business Address:
Suite 306
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 579-0624

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SI-LIANG PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017