skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 11:15:55 AM

Sarma, Shohinee

CPSO#: 109450

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Other

Education: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Murray St
Leadership Sinai Centre for Diabete
L5-029 Mailbox 16
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: 4165864800 Ext. 8465
Fax: 6476606460 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sarma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. S. Sarma ( CPSO# 109450)

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Division of Neuroradiology
3079 CC - 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5029

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2020 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:20 Sep 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHOHINEE SARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020