THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:53:32 AM
Ilnitsky, Sara Elizabeth
CPSO#:
106388
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:PCRM - Edmonton 3rd Floor
9888 Jasper Ave
Edmonton AB T5J 5C6
Date Received: 24 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility |
Effective:24 Sep 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Aug 2015
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2015 to 11 Oct 2015
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Oct 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Aug 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2019 |