skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 14:56:00 PM

Wong, Alyson Wai-Mun

CPSO#: 105556

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Nov 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Oct 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:22 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2015 to 03 May 2015
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2017 to 20 Nov 2017
EL - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2017