THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:16:34 PM
Chu, Derek Kuo-Cheng
CPSO#:
103349
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West, Room 3V49
Health Sciences Centre
McMaster University
Clinical Immunology & Allergy
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76374
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:04 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEREK KUO-CHENG CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 15 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 15 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |