THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:41:04 AM
Jarrett, Blair Lawrence
CPSO#:
102167
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 East Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6A 3C6
Phone: 705-759-7475
Fax: 705-949-1908
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BLAIR LAWRENCE JARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARRETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2015 |