skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 11/07/20 6:49:57 AM

Crespin, Marcelo Orlando

CPSO#: 101268

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto PGME
602 - 500 University Avenue
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:01 Jul 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 03 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020 Active
             1.    Dr.  Marcelo  Orlando  Crespin  may practise Psychiatry in Ontario, while
                  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires six months from the
                  date  of issuance or when Dr.Crespin's  eligibility  to  take  the  Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (I)   the  supervisor  notifies  the  College  of  any concerns regarding
                        Dr.Crespin's knowledge, skill, judgment or professionalism, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr.Crespin's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020, and will  expire on or before
                  December 31, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.