THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:09:47 PM
Keenan, Marissa
CPSO#:
101116
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut
Yukon
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:07 Oct 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jul 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 03 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 08 Sep 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2021 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2021 |