skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 06/07/20 1:52:01 AM

Wang, Xuan

CPSO#: 101060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1A
1383 16th avenue
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E2
Phone: (905) 918-3560
Fax: (905) 669-8646 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wang Ngo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ngo ( CPSO# 95651 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 101060)

Business Address:
1383 18th Avenue
Suite 1A
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 918-3560

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XUAN WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 04 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016