THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:21:22 AM
Golfam, Mohammad
CPSO#:
100808
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Hamadan Medical School, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Edmundston Regional Hospital
275 Boulevard Hébert
Edmundston NB E3V 4E4
Phone: (506) 739-2200
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD GOLFAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLFAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Nuclear Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2019 |