THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:29:26 AM
Rockman, Rebecca Frances
CPSO#:
100426
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2013
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
491 Eglinton Avenue
Toronto ON M5N 1A7
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:27 Jul 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REBECCA FRANCES ROCKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCKMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2018 |