THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:01:51 AM
de Rezende-Neto, Joao Baptista
CPSO#:
99828
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Donnelly Wing Room (Suite) 3-074
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5284
Fax: 416-864-5281
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |