THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:42:30 AM
Adebowale, Akinade Oluseyi
CPSO#:
99704
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: Obafemi Awolowo University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Healthcare London
550 Wellington Road
London, Ontario
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 646 6100
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AKINADE OLUSEYI ADEBOWALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEBOWALE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Dec 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Dec 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2014 |